## Vedic Mathematics Book PDF Summary

Dear readers, here we are providing a Vedic Mathematics Book PDF / Vedic Mathematics Book by Bharati Krishna Tirtha PDF to all of you. Vedic Mathematics is one of the most popular and scientific forms of Maths which has been proven with multiple illustrations. As you know that today people are more attracted to the modern practice of Maths but Vedic Mathematics has its own importance. We in India have good reasons to be proud of a rich heritage in science, philosophy,

and culture in general, coming to us down the ages. In mathematics, which is my own area of specialization, the ancient Indians not only took great strides long before the Greek advent, which is a standard reference point in the Western historical perspective but also enriched it for a long period making, in particular, some very fundamental contributions.

### Vedic Mathematics Book PDF by Bharati Krishna Tirtha

Author |
Bharati Krishna Tirtha |

Country |
India |

Subject |
Mental calculation |

Publisher |
Motilal Banarsidass |

Publication date |
1965 |

ISBN |
978-8120801646 |

OCLC |
217058562 |

**Five Rules of Vedic Mathematics –**

**Nikhilam Sutra**–

In this method, Numbers can be multiplied which are close to the power of 10.

Example –

**(1) 96 x 97** ( Both the numbers are close to the power of 10)

96 x 97

100 – 96 = 4

100 – 97 = 3

97 – 4 and 96 – 3 = 93

(-4) x (-3) = 12.

So, 96 x 97 = 9312.

**(2) 95 x 99**

100 – 95 = 5

100 – 99 = 1

95 – 1 and 99 – 5 = 94

(-1) x (-5) = 5

So, 95 x 99 = 9405

**Gyarasguna Sutra –**

In this method, numbers can be easily multiplied by 11. “Gyarasguna word split into three words. Gyara means 11, guna means Multiplication, and Sutra means method.

- write non 11 numbers twice
- Add “0” to one of the numbers
- Add both the numbers.

Example –

**(1) 55 x 11**

55 + 55

550 + 55 = 605

**(2) 66 x 11**

66 + 66

660 + 66 = 726.

**Ekanunena Purneva Sutra –**

In this method, numbers can be multiplied in which one of the numbers is multiplied by 9, 99, 999 …….

First, subtract 1 from 11, then subtract the resulting number from 99 or 999.

Example –

**(1) 11 x 99**

11 – 1 = 10

99 – 10 = 89

So, 11 x 99 = 1089

**(2) 12 x 99**

12 – 1 = 11

99 – 11 = 88

So, 12 x 99 = 1188

**Antyaordasake Pi.**

In this method, Multiplication can be done as follows –

Example –

**(1) 42 x 48**

First Number = 42

Second number = 48

Add 1 to the first digit of the second number –

= 4 + 1 = 5.

Now Multiply first digits of both numbers

4 x 5 = 20 .

Now, Multiply second digits of both numbers

2 x 8 = 16.

So, 42 x 48 = 2016

**(2) 54 x 56**

5 x 6 = 30

4 x 6 = 24

So, 54 x 56 = 3024.

**Navamguna Sutra –**

In this method, Multiplication can be done as follows –

Example –

**(1) 42 x 9**

42 (10-1)

42 x 10 – 42 x 1

420 – 42 = 378.

So, 42 x 9 = 378.

**(2) 72 x 99**

72 (100 – 1)

72 x 100 – 72 x 1

7200 – 72 = 7128.

So, 72 x 99 = 7128.

**You can download the Vedic Mathematics Book PDF by clicking on the following download button.**